In this Question 22 x 22 = 16 Actually 22 x 22 = 484

So Here, 22 x 22=16 in this 22 both 2 is add together 2+2 x 2+2 So, 4 x 4 = 16

22 x 22=16

So, 44 x 44= ? in this 44 both 4 is add together 4+4 x 4+4 So, 8 x 8= 64

**44 x 44= 64 so, Answer is 64**

In this QuestionÂ

2 = 2 which means 2 is multiply with before number 1

so, 2 x 1 = 2

Â Â Â 3 x 2 = 6

Â Â Â 4 x 3 = 12

Â Â Â 5 x 4 = 20Â

Â Â Â 6 x 5 =Â 30

Â Â Â 7 x 6 = 42

Â Â Â **8 x 7 = 56 soÂ Answer is 56**

in this Question 6 + 3 = 39, Actually 6 + 3 = 9

So, Here

6 + 3 = 39

6 – 3 = **3**

6 + 3 = **9**Â **So,Â Combine themÂ 39**

9 + 4 = 513

9 – 4 = **5**

9 + 4 = **13Â **

So,Â Combine themÂ **Â 513**

18 + 16 = 513

18 – 16 =Â 2

18 + 16 =Â

**34Â**

So,Â Combine themÂ Â 234

6 + 5 = 11

6 -5 =Â 1

6 + 5 =Â 11Â

So,Â Combine themÂ Answer is 111

Â

in this Question 3 x3 =04, Actually 3 x 3 = 9Â

So, HereÂ

3 x 3 = 04, Which means 3 before number is 2Â

So, 2 x 2 = 4

4 x 4 = 09 same like above 4 before 3

So, 3 x 3 =09

5 x 5 = 16 same like above 5 before 4

So, 4 x 4 = 16

7 x 7 = ?

7 before number 6 so , 6 x 6 = 36**Answer is 36**

Â

in this QuestionÂ

4 x 4 = 19 Actually 4 x4 = 16

So Here

4 x4 = 16 & add 4 above number 3

So,Â 16 +3 =19

5 x 5 = 25Â & add 5 above number 4

So,Â 25 + 4 = 29

6 x 6 = 36 & add 6 above number 5

So, 36+5 = 41

Then 7 x 7 = 49 and 7 above number is 6

So, 49+ 6 = 55**Answer is 55**

Â

in this Question 2 x 2 = 6, Actually 2 x 2 = 4

So,

2 x 2 = 4 + 2 =6

3 x 3 = 9 + 3 =12

4 x 4 = 16 + 4 =20

5 x 5 = 25 + 5 = 30**Answer is 30**

Â